Neck Hammock, The v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Neck Hammock, The
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00505
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Amazon.com, Inc. on 08/05/2019, filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The. (Platt, Brian)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/2/2019. (eat)
August 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead added. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to case. (eat)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g), and for purposes of efficiency and judicial economy, the court has determined that the same magistrate judge should handle all related cases filed by The Neck Hammock. Because Magistrate Judge Pead is currently assigned on the lowest-numbered case, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the instant case to Magistrate Judge Pead, pursuant to 18 USC 636(b)(1)(A). No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/2/2019. (eat)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/30/2019. (eat)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/30/2019. (eat)
July 29, 2019 Judge Dale A. Kimball added. Judge Jill N. Parrish no longer assigned to case. (eat)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Transferring Case to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/29/2019. (eat)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The (Platt, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The (Lorimer, Brent)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/23/19. (ss)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/19/19. (ss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Brian N. Platt in Support re #6 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Expedite Discovery before Rule 26(f) Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Platt, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Expedite Discovery before Rule 26(f) Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Platt, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer Related Cases by Neck Hammock, The (Platt, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office - TRADEMARK. (rks)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office - PATENT. (rks)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3326650) filed by Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Platt, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neck Hammock, The v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neck Hammock, The
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?