USA v. Custodian of Records for the State of Utah
Petitioner: USA
Respondent: Custodian of Records for the State of Utah
Case Number: 2:2019cv00510
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynda Lee Viti on behalf of Custodian of Records for the State of Utah (Viti, Lynda)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Hansen on behalf of Custodian of Records for the State of Utah (Hansen, J.)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/23/2019. (eat)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoena. Fee waived filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Steinvoort, Sandra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Petitioner USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Custodian of Records for the State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Custodian of Records for the State of Utah
Represented By: J. Michael Hansen
Represented By: Lynda Lee Viti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Sandra L. Steinvoort
Represented By: Joel A. Ferre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?