Ostovich v. Saul
Plaintiff: Bryan Ostovich
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notice
Case Number: 2:2019cv00513
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana W. Duncan for Bryan Ostovich. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/6/2019. (nl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Affirm pro hac vice and Memorandum in Support , First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana W Duncan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3342109, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Ostovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ban, Joel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Originally received by the court on 07/22/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Bryan Ostovich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (tlh)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/22/2019. (tlh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 07/22/2019) filed by Plaintiff Bryan Ostovich. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostovich v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Ostovich
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?