Neck Hammock, The v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Neck Hammock, The
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00518
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/21/2019. (eat)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Amazon.com, Inc. on 08/09/2019, filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The. (Platt, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/5/2019. (eat)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/2/2019. (eat)
August 2, 2019 Judge Dale A. Kimball added. Judge Dee Benson no longer assigned to case. (eat)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Transferring Case to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/2/2019. (eat)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Brian N. Platt in Support re #9 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Expedite Discovery before Rule 26(f) Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Platt, Brian)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Expedite Discovery before Rule 26(f) Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Platt, Brian)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer by Neck Hammock, The (Platt, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to District Judge per docket text order 6 . Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Given the procedural posture of this case, consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge by all parties is not feasible at this time. The plaintiff named Doe parties as defendants. These defendants have not been identified yet, let alone served. Because consent is not feasible, reassignment of this case to a district judge is warranted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/25/2019. (nas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (rks)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office - PATENT. (rks)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office - TRADEMARK. (rks)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3331589) filed by Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Platt, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neck Hammock, The v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neck Hammock, The
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?