Legocki v. Express Recovery Services et al
Plaintiff: Shawna Legocki
Defendant: Outsource Receivables Management and Express Recovery Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00528
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Shawna Legocki. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Express Recovery Services. (nl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Express Recovery Services, Outsource Receivables Management, Plaintiff Shawna Legocki. Form due by 9/27/2019. (nl)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Outsource Receivables Management answer due 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/11/2019. (nl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Outsource Receivables Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Ronald F. Price added to party Outsource Receivables Management(pty:dft)(Price, Ronald)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Express Recovery Services. Attorney Joseph J. Lico added to party Express Recovery Services(pty:dft)(Lico, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawna Legocki as to Outsource Receivables Management served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Hussey, Curtis)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawna Legocki as to Express Recovery Services served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Hussey, Curtis)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/29/2019. (nl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Outsource Receivables Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Express Recovery Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Express Recovery Services, Outsource Receivables Management (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3333363) filed by Shawna Legocki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 2, 2018 ERS Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Hussey, Curtis)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Shawna Legocki is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legocki v. Express Recovery Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Legocki
Represented By: Curtis R. Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outsource Receivables Management
Represented By: Ronald F. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Recovery Services
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?