Klein v. Shepard
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Klein
Defendant: Matthew Shepard
Case Number: 2:2019cv00533
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Matthew Shepard. (Paul, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Counter Defendant R. Wayne Klein, Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein. (Lehr, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Shepard. filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Balls, Jeffery)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/9/2019. (las)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Matthew Shepard. (nl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #7 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein, Defendant Matthew Shepard. Form due by 9/5/2019. (nl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against R. Wayne Klein filed by Matthew Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Counterclaim - Order Cancelling Shares, #2 Exhibit 2 to Counterclaim - Corrected Receivership Order) Attorney Steven R. Paul added to party Matthew Shepard(pty:dft)(Paul, Steven)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Wayne Klein as to Matthew Shepard served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Lehr, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Receiver's Motion to Transfer Related Cases Pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g) by R. Wayne Klein (Lehr, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew Shepard. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Matthew Shepard (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3334221) filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Balls, Jeffery)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shepard
Represented By: Steven R. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Klein
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?