Dansie v. Nielson et al
Plaintiff: Aimee Dansie
Defendant: Ron Jensen, Clear Pathways Residential and Matt Nielson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00537
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Clear Pathways Residential, Ron Jensen, Matt Nielson, Plaintiff Aimee Dansie. Form due by 10/10/2019. (nl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Aimee Dansie filed by Ron Jensen, Matt Nielson, Clear Pathways Residential. Attorney J. Brett Chambers added to party Clear Pathways Residential(pty:dft), Attorney J. Brett Chambers added to party Ron Jensen(pty:dft), Attorney J. Brett Chambers added to party Matt Nielson(pty:dft)(Chambers, J.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Dansie as to Ron Jensen served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement court issued summons)(Smith, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Dansie as to Clear Pathways Residential served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement court issued summons)(Smith, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Dansie as to Ron Jensen served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement court issued summons)(Smith, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Dansie as to Matt Nielson served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement court issued summons)(Smith, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #9 Return of Service, #8 Return of Service, and #7 Return of Service. The documents Return of Service were filed incorrectly. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as Summons Returned Executed. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for in person served on Ron Jensen on 08-13-2019, filed by Plaintiff Aimee Dansie. (Smith, Gregory) Modified on 8/27/2019 stricken for filing under wrong event (nl).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for in person served on Matt Nielsen on 08-20-2019, filed by Plaintiff Aimee Dansie. (Smith, Gregory) Modified on 8/27/2019 stricken for filing under wrong event(nl).
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for in person served on Clear Pathways on 8-20-2019, filed by Plaintiff Aimee Dansie. (Smith, Gregory) Modified on 8/27/2019 stricken for filing under wrong event(nl).
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Clear Pathways Residential. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ron Jensen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Matt Nielson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/30/2019. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT initial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3335441) filed by Aimee Dansie. (Attachments: #1 Appendix appendix) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Smith, Gregory)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Aimee Dansie is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dansie v. Nielson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Jensen
Represented By: J. Brett Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Pathways Residential
Represented By: J. Brett Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Nielson
Represented By: J. Brett Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Dansie
Represented By: Gregory Brent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?