Patel et al v. Central Utah Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Minal Ashokkumar Patel and Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel
Defendant: Revere Health, Jonathan Bowman, Kane County Human Resources Special Service District, Central Utah Clinic and Darin Ott
Case Number: 2:2019cv00542
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Epperson on behalf of Darin Ott (Epperson, Scott)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Epperson on behalf of Darin Ott (Epperson, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Epperson on behalf of Darin Ott (Epperson, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #9 Summons Issued Electronically, #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel.Darin Ott served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Nielson, G.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #14 Amended Complaint, #18 Summons Issued Electronically, Acknowledgment filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel.Jonathan Bowman served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Nielson, G.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #14 Amended Complaint, #15 Summons Issued Electronically, #17 Summons Issued Electronically, Acknowledgment filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel.Central Utah Clinic served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; Revere Health served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Nielson, G.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Darin Ott. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jonathan Bowman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Revere Health. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kane County Human Resources Special Service District. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Central Utah Clinic. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jonathan Bowman, Central Utah Clinic, Kane County Human Resources Special Service District, Darin Ott, Revere Health. filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel. (Nielson, G.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Kane County Human Resources Special Service District.Kane County Human Resources Special Service District served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Houser, Julia)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Summons Issued Electronically, #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel.Kane County Human Resources Special Service District served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Nielson, G.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Summons Issued Electronically, #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel.Jonathan Bowman served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Nielson, G.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued Electronically, #2 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued Electronically, Acknowledgment filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel.Central Utah Clinic served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Revere Health served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Nielson, G.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Darin Ott. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jonathan Bowman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Revere Health. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kane County Human Resources Special Service District. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Central Utah Clinic. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/1/2019. (las)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/31/2019. (tco)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Bowman, Central Utah Clinic, Kane County Human Resources Special Service District, Darin Ott, Revere Health (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3336083) filed by Minal Ashokkumar Patel, Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet List of Defendants' attorneys) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Dahl, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiffs Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel and Minal Ashokkumar Patel are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Central Utah Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revere Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane County Human Resources Special Service District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Utah Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Ott
Represented By: Scott H. Epperson
Represented By: David C. Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minal Ashokkumar Patel
Represented By: Mark W. Dahl
Represented By: G. Eric Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilipkumar Sitarambhai Patel
Represented By: Mark W. Dahl
Represented By: G. Eric Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?