Security National Life Insurance v. Innovative Insurance Brokers et al
Plaintiff: Security National Life Insurance
Defendant: Innovative Financial Partners, Joshua Tyler Benson, Matthew Murray, Innovative Insurance Brokers, John Spinner and Jim Boyles
Case Number: 2:2019cv00546
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Security National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K) (Bagley, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support (Errata Version) filed by Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner. (Larsen, Mark)
September 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner. (Larsen, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/3/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Motions due by 11/24/2020. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/16/2019. (las)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/15/2019. (las)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner. (nl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Price, Gifford)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Security National Life Insurance. (nl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Joshua Tyler Benson answer due 8/30/2019; Jim Boyles answer due 8/30/2019; Innovative Financial Partners answer due 8/30/2019; Innovative Insurance Brokers answer due 8/30/2019; Matthew Murray answer due 8/30/2019; John Spinner answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/8/2019. (nl)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Plead and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner. (Larsen, Mark) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer.(nl).
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Return of Service J. Benson, #3 Return of Service J. Boyles, #4 Return of Service J. Spinner, #5 Return of Service M. Murray, #6 Return of Service Innovative Financial Partners, #7 Return of Service Innovative Insurance Brokers) (nl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney David G. Guidry, for Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner. (nl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Kellam Warren, for Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner (nl)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/1/2019. (nl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner, Plaintiff Security National Life Insurance. Form due by 8/16/2019. (nl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray, John Spinner, Plaintiff Security National Life Insurance. (nl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court of Salt Lake County, case number 19094986, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3337488) filed by Joshua Tyler Benson, Innovative Financial Partners, John Spinner, Jim Boyles, Matthew Murray, Innovative Insurance Brokers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Summons and Complaint, #3 Appendix Second Half of Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Larsen, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Joshua Tyler Benson, Jim Boyles, Innovative Financial Partners, Innovative Insurance Brokers, Matthew Murray and John Spinner are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security National Life Insurance v. Innovative Insurance Brokers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Financial Partners
Represented By: Mark A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Tyler Benson
Represented By: Mark A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Murray
Represented By: Mark A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Insurance Brokers
Represented By: Mark A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Spinner
Represented By: Mark A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Boyles
Represented By: Mark A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security National Life Insurance
Represented By: Matthew G. Bagley
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Stephens
Represented By: Gifford W. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?