Modern Font Applications v. Alaska Airlines
Plaintiff: Modern Font Applications
Defendant: Alaska Airlines
Case Number: 2:2019cv00561
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Alaska Airlines answer due 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/27/2019. (las)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Straight, Samuel) Modified on 9/27/2019 by correcting motion type (las).
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Straight on behalf of Alaska Airlines (Straight, Samuel)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Alaska Airlines answer due 9/27/2019. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/6/2019. (nl)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer and for the Parties to Comply with Paragraphs 1 and 2 of Order to Propose Schedule and Memorandum in Support (UNOPPOSED MOTION) filed by Plaintiff Modern Font Applications. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Clegg, Perry) Modified on 9/6/2019 corrected event to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (nl).
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Modern Font Applications as to Alaska Airlines served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Clegg, Perry)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/12/2019. (nl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alaska Airlines. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand against Alaska Airlines (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3345354) filed by Modern Font Applications. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Clegg, Perry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Modern Font Applications is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modern Font Applications v. Alaska Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Font Applications
Represented By: Perry S. Clegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?