Schulof v. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Daniel Schulof
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00562
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Summons returned Executed served on United States Attorney on 9/10/19 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Schulof. (jmr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Schulof. Department of Health and Human Services served on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (jmr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to US Attorney. (tlh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Attorney General. (tlh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Department of Health and Human Services. (tlh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/12/2019. (ncw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681087408) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Daniel Schulof. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulof v. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schulof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?