Hanover Insurance Company v. American International School of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: American International School, Michael Farley, Tasi Young and American International School of Utah
Case Number: 2:2019cv00567
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for American International School answer due 9/6/2019. (nl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanover Insurance Company as to American International School of Utah served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Sweeney, Scott)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanover Insurance Company as to American International School served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Sweeney, Scott) Modified on 8/30/2019 corrected service date. (nl).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/15/2019. (las)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to American International School. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to American International School of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3348381) filed by Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Sweeney, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Hanover Insurance Company is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company v. American International School of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasi Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International School of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?