Suda v. National Properties et al
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Defendant: Tony Abbasie and National Properties
Case Number: 2:2019cv00570
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Return of Service by Linda Suda re #6 Summons Returned Executed (Crane, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/17/2019. (las)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Plaintiff Linda Suda re #7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to National Properties, Inc. filed by Linda Suda . (Crane, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. per docket text order 8 . Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case, the #7 motion for entry of default and the inability of certain defendants to consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge because they have not pleaded or otherwise defended this case, consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge is not possible at this time. Accordingly, the undersigned orders this case be reassigned to a district judge through random assignment. No attached document Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/13/19. (mjw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to National Properties, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crane, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Suda as to National Properties served on 8/17/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crane, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/15/2019. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tony Abbasie. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to National Properties. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Tony Abbasie, National Properties (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3348798) filed by Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Crane, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Linda Suda is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suda v. National Properties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Abbasie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Represented By: Matthew B. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?