Larson v. DeMando et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Eric Larson
Defendant: Luxottica Optical Manufacturing and Thomas I. DeMando
Case Number: 2:2019cv00572
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/21/2019. Discovery due by 5/5/2020. Motions due by 6/22/2020. Status Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (See order for other deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/10/2019. (jwt)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Arthur Eric Larson as to Luxottica Optical Manufacturing. (Tycksen, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Tycksen, Steven)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Eric Larson as to Luxottica Optical Manufacturing served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Tycksen, Steven)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/20/2019. (ncw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups per docket text order 9 . Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. In #8 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING, the parties who have appeared indicated that they do not consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 09/19/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Tycksen, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Luxottica Optical Manufacturing. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Thomas DeMando's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Thomas I. DeMando.(Snow, Tyler)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/15/2019. (nl)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Returnd Summons T. Demando, #4 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Thomas I. DeMando and Plaintiff Arthur Eric Larson. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190905151, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3348991) filed by Thomas I. DeMando. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Utah Business Entity Search, #4 Exhibit D - Ohio Corporation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Snow, Tyler)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Thomas I. DeMando is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. DeMando et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Eric Larson
Represented By: Steven C. Tycksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica Optical Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas I. DeMando
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Represented By: Kristen C. Kiburtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?