Watkins et al v. Preserve Owners Association et al
Plaintiff: Dane Watkins and Sherry Watkins
Defendant: Zachary A. Bloomer and Preserve Owners Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00578
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/17/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/03/2019. (nl)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Lichfield, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Zachary A. Bloomer, Preserve Owners Association, Plaintiffs Dane Watkins, Sherry Watkins. (nl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Dane Watkins, Sherry Watkins. (nl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Zachary A. Bloomer, Preserve Owners Association. (nl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Zachary A. Bloomer, Preserve Owners Association, Plaintiffs Dane Watkins, Sherry Watkins. Form due by 9/27/2019. (nl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Zachary A. Bloomer. Attorney Lincoln W. Hobbs added to party Zachary A. Bloomer(pty:dft)(Hobbs, Lincoln)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Preserve Owners Association. Attorney Lincoln W. Hobbs added to party Preserve Owners Association(pty:dft)(Hobbs, Lincoln)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Watkins, Dane Watkins as to Zachary A. Bloomer served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Lichfield, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Watkins, Dane Watkins as to Preserve Owners Association served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Lichfield, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/20/2019. (nl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Zachary A. Bloomer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Preserve Owners Association. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Zachary A. Bloomer, Preserve Owners Association (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3352038) filed by Sherry Watkins, Dane Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Lichfield, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Dane Watkins, Sherry Watkins is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins et al v. Preserve Owners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane Watkins
Represented By: Nathan D. Anderson
Represented By: Michael D. Lichfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Watkins
Represented By: Nathan D. Anderson
Represented By: Michael D. Lichfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary A. Bloomer
Represented By: Lincoln W. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preserve Owners Association
Represented By: Lincoln W. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?