Lopez v. Salt Lake City Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roland Lopez
Defendant: Jim Lewis, Salt Lake City Corporation and Sybilla Dalton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00589
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/17/19 (alt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time Response to MSJ filed by Plaintiff Roland Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation of Parties)(Ball, Ronald)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Sybilla Dalton, Jim Lewis, Salt Lake City Corporation. (Pappasideris, Jonathan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline. Answer deadline updated for defendants Sybilla Dalton, Jim Lewis and Salt Lake City Corporation answers due 9/18/2019. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/4/2019. (jds)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 File Received, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Sybilla Dalton, Jim Lewis, Salt Lake City Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline)(Pappasideris, Jonathan)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/30/2019. (jds)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court 3rd District Court and Memorandum in Support Objection filed by Defendants Sybilla Dalton, Jim Lewis, Salt Lake City Corporation. (Pappasideris, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 File Downloaded from XChangeWEB for 3rd District Court, SL County, consisting of copies of docket sheet and documents filed in state court (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Ntc of Removal, #3 Amended Complaint filed in State Court 2 days after case was removed, #4 Mailing certificate no attached to amended complaint) (alt)
August 24, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court 3rd District Court and Memorandum in Support Objection filed by Plaintiff Roland Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Salt Lake City, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service Dalton, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service Lewis, #4 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Ball, Ronald)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Sybilla Dalton, Jim Lewis, Salt Lake City Corporation and Plaintiff Roland Lopez. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 190906199, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3356028) filed by Jim Lewis, Salt Lake City Corporation, Sybilla Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to Salt Lake City, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Sybilla Dalton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to Jim Lewis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Pappasideris, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Defendants Sybilla Dalton, Jim Lewis and Salt Lake City Corporation are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Salt Lake City Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan G. Pappasideris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake City Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan G. Pappasideris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sybilla Dalton
Represented By: Jonathan G. Pappasideris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Lopez
Represented By: Ronald Ball, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?