Headman v. Hansen
Plaintiff: Alan Headman
Defendant: Royal I. Hansen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00592
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Electronic Notice. This Order only permits Mr. Headman to receive notice via e-mail; it does not give Mr. Headman the right to file any documents via e-mail. Mr. Headman is still required to file all documents conventionally (i.e. by mail or in-person delivery). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/9/19. (dla)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Mr. Headman shall answer or otherwise respond to #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than October 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/9/19. (dla)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Electronic Notice filed by Plaintiff Alan Headman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Electronic Noticing Registration Form) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Alan Headman. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Royal I. Hansen re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Terry, Rachel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Royal I. Hansen. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Terry, Rachel)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/25/2019. (mjm)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint: Hansen shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/16/19. (dla)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Royal I. Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Rachel G. Terry added to party Royal I. Hansen(pty:dft)(Terry, Rachel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alan Headman as to Royal I. Hansen served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (dla)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Royal I. Hansen. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal I. Hansen (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681087560) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Alan Headman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headman v. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal I. Hansen
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Headman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?