Moomey v. Office of Recovery Services
Plaintiff: Douglas Richard Moomey
Defendant: Office of Recovery Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00593
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Douglas Richard Moomey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(jds)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Douglas Richard Moomey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jds)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/15/2019. (reb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Office of Recovery Services. (Goff, Darin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Douglas Richard Moomey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jds)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Office of Recovery Services. (Goff, Darin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Douglas Richard Moomey. (nl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Office of Recovery Services. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Douglas Richard Moomey, Defendant Office of Recovery Services. Form due by 10/1/2019. (nl)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Office of Recovery Services answer due 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/12/2019. (nl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Office of Recovery Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Office of Recovery Services(pty:dft)(Goff, Darin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Office of Recovery Services. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of Recovery Services (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681087569) (Fee Status: paid) filed by Douglas Richard Moomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #4 Envelope 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moomey v. Office of Recovery Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Richard Moomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Recovery Services
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?