Quten Research Institute v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Quten Research Institute
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00603
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas by Quten Research Institute re #11 Order on Motion for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Amazon.com, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to Ebay Inc., #3 Exhibit 3 - Subpoena to UPS Store Inc.) (Dunaway, Alan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Modification of Docket: Correction: Attached approved minute entry. re #8 Motion Hearing. (kpf)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Ex Parte #3 Motion for Immediate Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/9/19. (jmr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Modification of Docket: Error: Document docketed in the wrong case. Correction: Case docket modified and document sent back to the dft. re #9 Lodged Document. (kpf)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY ERROR: DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the court.. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf) Modified document docketed in the wrong case 9/6/2019 (kpf).
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2019 re #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Take Immediate Discovery filed by Quten Research Institute. Attorney for Plaintiff Jason M. Kerr, Alan Dunaway. Court Reporter: Phoebe Moorhead.(kpf) Modified on to add text and image 9/20/2019 (kpf).
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to Take Immediate Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 at 01:30 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins per docket text order 5 . Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. In light of the procedural posture of this case, the pending #3 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Take Immediate Discovery, and unknown defendant(s), consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge is not feasible at this time. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/28/19. No attached document. (jfm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Take Immediate Discovery filed by Plaintiff Quten Research Institute. (Kerr, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3359166) filed by Quten Research Institute. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Kerr, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Quten Research Institute is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quten Research Institute v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quten Research Institute
Represented By: Alan Dunaway
Represented By: Jason M. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?