Jackson v. Zions Bank et al
Plaintiff: Karma Jackson
Defendant: Sarah Petersen and Zions Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv00607
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Karma Jackson. (nl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/3/2019. (nl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Complaint Ex 1- Right to Sue, #3 State Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (nl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Karma Jackson, Defendants Sarah Petersen, Zions Bank. Form due by 9/16/2019. (nl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Karma Jackson, Defendants Sarah Petersen, Zions Bank. (nl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190905200, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3362083) filed by Zions Bank, Sarah Petersen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Acceptance of Service, Complaint, Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Benard, Bryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendants Sarah Petersen, Zions Bank is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Zions Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Petersen
Represented By: Bryan K. Benard
Represented By: Karina Sargsian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zions Bank
Represented By: Bryan K. Benard
Represented By: Karina Sargsian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karma Jackson
Represented By: Katherine Allyce Panzer
Represented By: April L. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?