Salt Lake County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Salt Lake County
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Allergan Finance, Walmart, Allergan PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance, McKesson Corporation, Walgreen Co, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Actavis PLC, Cephalon, Russell K. Portenoy, Purdue Pharma Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Stores, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Cardinal Health, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Lynn Webster, Endo Health Solutions, Noramco Inc, Specgx LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Actavis Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA and Lynn R. Webster
Case Number: 2:2019cv00626
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 35 RECEIPT: remand order received by 3rd District Court on 10/16/19 (alt)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER from MDL Panel Vacating Conditional Transfer Order signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/10/2019. (jwt)
October 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to 3rd District Court, SL County: Notice and copy of order with docket sheet sent via US Mail (alt)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand; denying as moot #27 Motion to Stay - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/9/19 (alt)
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Salt Lake County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Order)(Kaplan, Richard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to 3rd Judicial District Court for Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Salt Lake County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Webster Case List)(Hale, Andrew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to 3rd Judicial District Court for Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Joyce, Joseph)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Nathaniel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Response Memo). Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/23/19 (alt)
September 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING re #24 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Order Granting Consent filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Joyce, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Joyce, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Salt Lake County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order) (Kaplan, Richard)
September 18, 2019 Case Stayed per #22 Notice of Bankruptcy (rks)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by Purdue Pharma LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition) (McOmber, Elisabeth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Expedite Treatment of the Motion toRemand. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/16/2019. (jds)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel G. Ward on behalf of Walmart (Ward, Nathaniel)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants shall file responsive pleadings to the complaint 14 days after the earlier of: (1) an order transferring this case to the MDL panel in Ohio or, (2) this courts order on Plaintiffs motion to remand. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/12/19 (alt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The document is a second extension motion filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance ostensibly with another party who has yet to file their appearance. The clerk is terminating this motion and the first motion filed, #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, will be ruled on. All parties will need to file proper appearances in this case. (alt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support , #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Salt Lake County. (Kaplan, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The documents should not have been filed as "joinder" motions as those are disallowed per DUCivR 7-1(a)(4). Parties must only file their own motions requesting a relief and not link to any other party's motion. Also, parties should not select other parties as filers if they are not appearing for those parties. The word "Joint" should simply be used at the beginning of the motion entry and the document will speak for itself as to who the other filing parties are. The clerk has terminated the second incorrect motion #14 and corrected the entry text for the first motion filed #10 to indicate that this is and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer being filed by Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals. (alt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler V. Snow on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC (Snow, Tyler)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 ERROR: INCORRECTLY FILED PER DUCivR 7-1(a)(4) - Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joinder filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Manufacturer Defendants to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint)(Durkin, Marcia) Modified on 9/12/2019: error text added, non-appearing parties removed (alt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 ERROR: FILING PARTY ALREADY HAS MOTION PENDING - Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint)(Joyce, Joseph) Modified on 9/12/2019: added error text (alt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Lewis on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals (Lewis, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Setting Briefing Schedule, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) Attorney Trevor C. Lang added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)(Lang, Trevor)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Endo Pharmaceuticals. Attorney Marcia Fuller Durkin added to party Endo Health Solutions(pty:dft), Attorney Marcia Fuller Durkin added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals (pty:dft) (Durkin, Marcia) Modified on 9/12/2019: entry text corrected to remove non-appearing parties and indicate that this is not to be a joinder with another party's motion (DUCivR 7-1(a)(4) (alt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to 3rd Judicial District Court for Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Salt Lake County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initiating a New Case)(Kaplan, Richard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joyce, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to 3rd Judicial District Court for Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition to Request for Expedited Treatment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Opposition to Request for Expedited Treatmen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Opposition to Request for Expedited Treatmen, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Opposition to Request for Expedited Treatmen, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Opposition to Request for Expedited Treatmen)(Joyce, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Ben Harrington in Support re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to 3rd Judicial District Court for Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Salt Lake County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Manufacturer Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Dr. Webster Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Consolidate, #5 Exhibit E - Distributor Defendants Motion to Stay, #6 Exhibit F - Webster Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit G - Order Regarding Remand)(Kaplan, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to 3rd Judicial District Court for Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support , Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Salt Lake County. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting SLCo's Motion for Expedited Treatment)(Kaplan, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Modification of Docket re #2 Notice of Removal. Error: Removed State Court Case number (180500119) originally entered, which is the case number appearing on the removed Amended Complaint is a Consolidated Case, but not all consolidated plaintiffs filed the Amended Complaint. Correction: Removed State Court Case number has been corrected to Salt Lake County's original State Court Case number (180902421) - that is the case that is being removed to our court. (alt)
September 6, 2019 Remark: state court case number 180500119 and case name "Salt Lake County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al" do not match in the state court filing records system (alt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance re #2 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Docket #2 Exhibit B, State Summons and Complaint)(Joyce, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Salt Lake County and Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance. (tlh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180902421, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3365839) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Joyce, Joseph) Modified by correcting state case number per chambers on 9/9/2019 (rks).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salt Lake County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Nathaniel G. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy G. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Trevor C. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy G. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell K. Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Marcia Fuller Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Marcia Fuller Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn R. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt Lake County
Represented By: Andrew R. Hale
Represented By: Bridget K. Romano
Represented By: Richard A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?