W. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sarah W. and A. L.
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company and Mount Kisco Medical Group PC Healthcare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00629
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarah W., A. L. as to Mount Kisco Medical Group PC Healthcare Benefit Plan Waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (King, Brian)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarah W., A. L. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (King, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, Mount Kisco Medical Group PC Healthcare Benefit Plan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3366192) filed by Sarah W., A. L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (King, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiffs A. L. and Sarah W. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Kisco Medical Group PC Healthcare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah W.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?