Tatuyou v. Saniderm Medical
Plaintiff: Tatuyou
Defendant: Saniderm Medical
Case Number: 2:2019cv00633
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING IN PART EX PARTE MOTION TO RECOGNIZE OR TO GRANT ALTERNATIVESERVICE OF PROCESS - granting in part #9 Motion for Service of Process. The Court ORDERS that Defendant has 21 DAYS from the date of this Order to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/22/19. (jmr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William Chadwick on behalf of Saniderm Medical (Chadwick, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #9 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Saniderm Medical, LLC filed by Plaintiff Tatuyou. (Shapiro, Joseph)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Saniderm Medical, LLC filed by Plaintiff Tatuyou. (Shapiro, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Saniderm Medical, LLC filed by Defendant Saniderm Medical. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aycock, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Aycock on behalf of Saniderm Medical (Aycock, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups per docket text order 10 . Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case and the pending #9 Motion for Service of Process, the undersigned ORDERS that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/27/19. (jfm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Saniderm Medical, LLC filed by Plaintiff Tatuyou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non-Service, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Joseph Shapiro in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Recognize Service, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service of Posted Summons and Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Shapiro, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dustin R. Dufault for Tatuyou. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/10/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dustin R. DuFault , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3368592, filed by Plaintiff Tatuyou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Admission)(Shapiro, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/9/2019. (nl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Dustin R. DuFault, for Plaintiff Tatuyou (tlh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Saniderm Medical. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Jury Demanded) against Saniderm Medical (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3366793) filed by Tatuyou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Shapiro, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Tatuyou is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatuyou v. Saniderm Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatuyou
Represented By: Joseph M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saniderm Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?