Empyreal Asset Management v. West Haven Property et al
Plaintiff: Empyreal Asset Management
Defendant: Westport Capital Partners and West Haven Property
Case Number: 2:2019cv00634
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Stipulated #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline updated for West Haven Property answer due 12/5/2019; Westport Capital Partners answer due 12/5/2019. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/1/19. (jmr)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint filed by Defendants West Haven Property, Westport Capital Partners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney J. Derek Kearl added to party West Haven Property(pty:dft), Attorney J. Derek Kearl added to party Westport Capital Partners(pty:dft)(Kearl, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empyreal Asset Management as to Westport Capital Partners served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Froerer, Zane)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empyreal Asset Management as to West Haven Property served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Froerer, Zane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Westport Capital Partners. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to West Haven Property. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Empyreal Asset Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Term Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B AMA) (Froerer, Zane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Asset Management identifying Empyreal Ventures, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Froerer, Zane)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs are directed to respond in writing by 9/24/19 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to properly plead diversity jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/9/19. (jmr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3365852) filed by Empyreal Asset Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Term Sheet as Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Contract as Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Froerer, Zane)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Empyreal Asset Management is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empyreal Asset Management v. West Haven Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westport Capital Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Haven Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empyreal Asset Management
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?