Center for Biological Diversity et al v. US Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Living Rivers, Utah Rivers Council, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity and Sierra Club
Defendant: US Bureau of Reclamation and US Department of the Interior
Petitioner: Utah Board of Water Resources and State of Utah
Case Number: 2:2019cv00636
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/11/19. (dla)
October 11, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #47 filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council (Greenwood, Christine)
October 11, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Defendants US Bureau of Reclamation, US Department of the Interior (Najjar, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, filed by State of Utah, Utah Board of Water Resources.(Document originally filed as Exhibit 3 to #24 Motion to Intervene )(jds)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #24 State of Utahs unopposed Motion to Intervene. It is further ORDERED that the State of Utahs Answer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed as of this date. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/8/2019. (jds)
October 8, 2019 Filing 51 Motions No Longer Referred: #24 MOTION to Intervene will be handled by the District Judge. (cvm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Greenwood, Christine)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/4/19. (ss)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas Wakefield Wolf for Center for Biological Diversity,Douglas Wakefield Wolf for Colorado Riverkeeper,Douglas Wakefield Wolf for Living Rivers,Douglas Wakefield Wolf for Sierra Club,Douglas Wakefield Wolf for Utah Rivers Council. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/4/2019. No attached document. (jds)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/4/19. (ss)
October 3, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas W. Wolf , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3388280, filed by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenwood, Christine)
September 26, 2019 Filing 45 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 44 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants US Bureau of Reclamation, US Department of the Interior. (nl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing the Administrative Record filed by Defendants US Bureau of Reclamation, US Department of the Interior (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jared Baxter, #2 Exhibit Index for the Administrative Record) (Najjar, Jennifer)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Clarification and for Leave to File Administrative Record on September 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/24/2019. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 41 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File the Administrative Record on September 25, 2019 filed by Defendants US Bureau of Reclamation, US Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Najjar, Jennifer)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William J. Snape for Center for Biological Diversity, for Colorado Riverkeeper, for Living Rivers, and for Sierra Club. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/10/2019. (nl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William J. Snape III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3369401, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenwood, Christine)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa T. Belenky for Center for Biological Diversity, for Colorado Riverkeeper,for Living Rivers, and for Sierra Club. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/10/2019. (nl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council, Movants State of Utah, Utah Board of Water Resources, Defendants US Bureau of Reclamation, US Department of the Interior. Form due by 9/25/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa T. Belenky , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3368650, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenwood, Christine)
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine T. Greenwood on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council (Greenwood, Christine)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/9/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Najjar on behalf of US Bureau of Reclamation, US Department of the Interior (Najjar, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney William John Snape, III, for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council (rks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Douglas Wakefield Wolf and Lisa T. Belenky, for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Rivers Council (rks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 Case transferred in from USDC of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-00789. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner.
September 6, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Utah, pursuant to the Court Order entered 8/20/2019. Sent to Court via extraction. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 8/30/2019. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case #12 ; denying as moot #13 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/20/2019. (lcrcl3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (Wolf, Douglas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsie Lynn Last on behalf of STATE OF UTAH, Utah Board of Water Resources (Last, Kelsie) (Main Document 25 replaced on 8/2/2019) (zjf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene by STATE OF UTAH, Utah Board of Water Resources (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rampton, Anthony)[Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Certified list of contents of Administrative Record due by 9/19/2019. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. The government shall file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record by 09/19/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/26/2019. (lcrcl3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 AMENDED Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Philpott, Romney) Modified text and added docket entry relationship on 7/8/2019 (tth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D)(Wolf, Douglas) Modified on 6/24/2019 to add additional filer (jf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (Wolf, Douglas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (Wolf, Douglas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Wakefield Wolf on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wolf, Douglas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2019.) (Snape, William) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ashley Najjar on behalf of All Defendants (Najjar, Jennifer) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/08/2019. (lcrcl3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lisa T. Belenky, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway St, Suite 800, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 5108447107. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6041949. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (California), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #7 MOTION for Order Pro Hac Vice Admission Re: Lisa Belenky was entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event (Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) and pay the filing fee. (znmw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Order Pro Hac Vice Admission Re: Lisa Belenky by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (California), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) Modified on 4/4/2019 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COLORADO RIVERKEEPER. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LIVING RIVERS. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014017) filed by UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BuRec, #3 Summons Interior, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Declaration Rule 26 (CBD), #7 Declaration Rule 26 (Living Rivers), #8 Declaration Rule 26 (Colorado Riverkeeper), #9 Declaration Rule 26 (Utah Rivers Council))(Snape, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2019) (zef, ). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. US Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Romney S. Philpott
Represented By: Jennifer A. Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Interior
Represented By: Romney S. Philpott
Represented By: Jennifer A. Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Rivers
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: William J. Snape, III
Represented By: Douglas W. Wolf
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Rivers Council
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: Douglas W. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Riverkeeper
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: William J. Snape, III
Represented By: Douglas W. Wolf
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: William J. Snape, III
Represented By: Douglas W. Wolf
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: William J. Snape, III
Represented By: Douglas W. Wolf
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Utah Board of Water Resources
Represented By: Anthony L. Rampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Utah
Represented By: Anthony L. Rampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?