B&W Custom Truck Beds v. Weigh Safe
Plaintiff: B&W Custom Truck Beds
Defendant: Weigh Safe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00639
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (las)
November 4, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. (las)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff B&W Custom Truck Beds (Burton, H.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/12/2019. (las)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/11/2019. (las)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Kent R. Erickson, Kyle D. Donnelly and James Kernell, for Plaintiff B&W Custom Truck Beds. (nl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3368202) filed by B&W Custom Truck Beds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - USPN 6974148, #3 Exhibit B - USPN 7819416, #4 Exhibit C - Weigh Safe Photos w numbers, #5 Exhibit D - Web site pages Weigh safe 180 Hitch, #6 Exhibit E - Preliminary claim chart, #7 Exhibit F - May 18, 2017 cease and desist letter) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Burton, H.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Plaintiff B&W Custom Truck Beds is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&W Custom Truck Beds v. Weigh Safe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&W Custom Truck Beds
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weigh Safe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?