Equitable National Life Insurance et al v. AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Equitable National Life Insurance and Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA SA and AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00644
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 35 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AXA SA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 34 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Krannich, Jess)
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Equitable National Life Insurance, Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Timothy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Smith, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carly J. Halpin for Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/21/19. (dla)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. Sefick for Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/21/19. (dla)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis J. Earley for Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/21/19. (dla)
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carly J. Halpin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398966, filed by Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Carly Halpin, #2 Exhibit B- ECF Registration for Carly Halpin, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Carly J. Halpin)(Smith, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. Sefick , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398960, filed by Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice John Sefick, #2 Exhibit b-ECF Registration for John Sefick, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Proc Hac Vice Admission of John Sefick)(Smith, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis J. Earley , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398940, filed by Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Francis J. Earley, #2 Exhibit B- ECF Registration for Francis J. Earley, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Francis Earley)(Smith, Timothy)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dale M. Cendali for AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/11/19 (alt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Johanna Schmitt for AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/11/19 (alt)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dale M. Cendali , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3393544, filed by Defendants AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission and Consent of Local Counsel)(Krannich, Jess)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Johanna Schmitt , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3393532, filed by Defendants AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Krannich, Jess)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company identifying AXA Equitable Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Krannich, Jess)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dale M. Cendali, Esq. in Support of Defendants AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company's and AXA Eqitable Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Catherine M.C. Farrelly, Esq. in Support of Defendants AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company's and AXA Equitable Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Krannich, Jess)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess M. Krannich on behalf of AXA Equitable Holdings, AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company (Krannich, Jess)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AXA SA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/2/19. (dla)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/1/2019. (mjm)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Devin R. Bates for Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/25/19. (dla)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clayborne S. Stone for Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, for Equitable National Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/25/19. (dla)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda W. Denton for Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/25/19. (dla)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Devin R. Bates , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3380034, filed by Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV for Devin Bates, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration form for Devin Bates, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Proc Hac Vice Admission of Devin Bates)(Smith, Timothy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clayborne S. Stone , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3380007, filed by Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV for Clay Stone, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration form for Clay Stone, #3 Text of Proposed Order B - ECF Registration form for Clay Stone)(Smith, Timothy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda W. Denton , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3379996, filed by Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company, Equitable National Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission PHV for Amanda Denton, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration form for Amanda Denton, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Proc Hac Vice Admission of A. Denton)(Smith, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ** CORRECTED** NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Amanda Denton, Clayborne S. Stone and Devin R. Bates, for Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company and Equitable National Life Insurance (tlh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Equitable National Life Insurance, Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company as to AXA Equitable Holdings served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Smith, Timothy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Equitable National Life Insurance, Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company as to AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Smith, Timothy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AXA Equitable Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Amanda Denton, Clayborne S. Stone and Devin R. Bates, for Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company and Equitable National Life Insurance. (tlh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3371088) filed by Equitable National Life Insurance, Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Smith, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiffs Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company and Equitable National Life Insurance are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equitable National Life Insurance et al v. AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Equitable Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equitable National Life Insurance
Represented By: Timothy B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?