Clark-Miller et al v. Skywest Airlines
Plaintiff: Debra D. Clark-Miller and William G. Miller
Defendant: Skywest Airlines
Case Number: 2:2019cv00651
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 19:1305
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Debra D. Clark-Miller, William G. Miller. (Newman, Barry)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler V. Snow on behalf of Skywest Airlines (Snow, Tyler)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Skywest Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Kristen C. Kiburtz added to party Skywest Airlines(pty:dft)(Kiburtz, Kristen)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to extend the timefor the parties to conduct their Attorney Planning Meeting and to file their associated Scheduling Report. The Parties are directed to conduct their Attorney Planning Meeting and file their Joint Attorney Planning Meeting Report form by Monday, December 2, 2019, absent further Orders of the Court. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/24/2019. (jds)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Compliance with Rule 26(f) procedures filed by Plaintiffs Debra D. Clark-Miller, William G. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, Barry)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Skywest Airlines (jds)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant SkyWest Airlines, Inc. and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Debra D. Clark-Miller, William G. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Defendant's corporate registration)(Newman, Barry)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra D. Clark-Miller, William G. Miller as to Skywest Airlines served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Newman, Barry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Skywest Airlines. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Barry Edward Newman for Debra D. Clark-Miller,Barry Edward Newman for William G. Miller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/13/2019. (jds)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Barry E. Newman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3372768, filed by Plaintiffs Debra D. Clark-Miller, William G. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- pro hac vice Application, #2 Exhibit b - ECF Application, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good standing)(Dodd, Roger)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Skywest Airlines (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3372668) filed by Debra D. Clark-Miller, William G. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil Cover sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Dodd, Roger)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiffs Debra D. Clark-Miller and William G. Miller are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark-Miller et al v. Skywest Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra D. Clark-Miller
Represented By: Barry Edward Newman
Represented By: Roger J. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Miller
Represented By: Barry Edward Newman
Represented By: Roger J. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skywest Airlines
Represented By: Kristen C. Kiburtz
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?