Smith v. Intermountain Healthcare, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Linda Smith
Defendant: Intermountain Healthcare, Inc and SelectHealth
Case Number: 2:2019cv00670
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Intermountain Healthcare, Inc answer due 12/13/2019; SelectHealth answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2019. (nl)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, SelectHealth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiFrancesco, Lauren) Modified on 11/21/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (nl).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #20 Motion for Extension of Time for failure to establish good cause for the extension. If the parties seek to extend the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2019. No attached document. (ang)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, SelectHealth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco added to party Intermountain Healthcare, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco added to party SelectHealth(pty:dft)(DiFrancesco, Lauren)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer Case by Linda Smith (Egan, Austin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason S. Cowart for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/18/2019. (nl)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew N. Goldfarb for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/18/2019. (nl)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of D. Brian Hufford for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/18/2019. (nl)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Cowart , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3396680, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Goldfarb , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3396659, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of D. Brian Hufford , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3396637, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meiram Bendat for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/11/2019. (nl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBITS filed by Linda Smith re #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meiram Bendat , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3393691,. (Egan, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meiram Bendat does not include a copy of the required pro hac vice application. Exhibits A and B to the motion are copies of the same ECF registration form. Plaintiff must file a copy of the application. The Motion will not be addressed until a copy of the application is received. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/11/2019. (nas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meiram Bendat , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3393691, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit ECF Regisration)(Egan, Austin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Smith as to SelectHealth Waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Egan, Austin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Smith as to Intermountain Healthcare, Inc Waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Egan, Austin)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/24/2019. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Andrew N. Goldfarb, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Meiram Bendat, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney D. Brian Hufford and Jason S. Cowart, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3378455) filed by Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Egan, Austin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Linda Smith is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Intermountain Healthcare, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermountain Healthcare, Inc
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SelectHealth
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Smith
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stavros
Represented By: D. Brian Hufford
Represented By: Andrew N. Goldfarb
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Represented By: Meiram Bendat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?