Goodsell v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The
Plaintiff: Travis Wayne Goodsell
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv00711
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The. filed by Travis Wayne Goodsell. (jmr)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse: Status Conference held on 11/1/2019. Plaintiff present. Court hears from the Plaintiff. Court instructs the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 1:05:08, Time End: 1:18:52, Room 8.400.)(lnp)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 ADDENDUM to #3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Travis Wayne Goodsell. (jmr)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 01:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Court Address: 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (lnp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ADDENDUM to #3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Travis Wayne Goodsell. (jmr)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636(b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/15/2019. (cdp)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints filed by Plaintiff Travis Wayne Goodsell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jmr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The (Originally received by the court on 09/30/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Travis Wayne Goodsell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (tlh)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/01/2019. (tlh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 9/30/2019) filed by Plaintiff Travis Wayne Goodsell. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodsell v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Wayne Goodsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?