Mecham et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammie Mecham and Dennie Mecham
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00750
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Sabrina R. Gallo, for Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (jwt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert R. Kane, III, for Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (jwt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Lori G. Cohen, Richard B. North, Jr., for Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (jwt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Joseph P. Griffith, for Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (jwt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Candace Headen Uduebor, Jennifer Marie Little, Lindsay Nicole Uhl, for Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (jwt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Anne Vankirk, Britt Alicia Birkenbuel, for Plaintiffs Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham (jwt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 49 Case transferred in from USDC of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-11260. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to District Judge Jill N. Parrish.
October 9, 2019 Filing 48 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:10-md-02187 - C. R. Bard, Inc. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/10/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/9/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/26/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Lindsay N. Uhl for C. R. Bard, Inc. (Uhl, Lindsay) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Karla K. Chamberlain, MA, LMFT on December 4, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. MST (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 44 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #41 Memorandum In Opposition. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY MEMORANDUM by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #42 Memorandum In Opposition. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham in opposition to #39 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham in opposition to #37 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit or Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Ralph Zipper, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Birkenbuel, Britt) (Modified document title on 10/29/2018) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #39 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #37 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to LIMIT OR EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF RALPH ZIPPER, M.D. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude OR LIMIT CERTAIN OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF RALPH ZIPPER, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRETRIAL ORDER # 294 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) The settlement conferences will be conducted as follows: 1. For the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 11/7/2018, at 9:00 a.m. in room 6200B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter; 2. For the cases identified on Exhibit B, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 11/8/2018, at 9:00 a.m. in room 6200B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter; 3. For the cases identified on Exhibit C, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 11/9/2018, at 9:00 a.m. in room 6200B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter; it is ORDERED that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice; it is further ORDERED that if the parties reach a settlement in a case listed on Exhibits A, B or C, submission of an inactive docket order for that case will relieve plaintiff and her counsel from the obligation of attending the mandatory settlement conference; finally, it is ORDERED that the cases identified as resolved and pending dismissal, identified in the attached Exhibit D, must be dismissed by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/11/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases identified on Exhibits A, B, C, and D) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham for Supplemental Expert Disclosure Pursuant to PTO #283 and Non-Retained Expert Disclosure Pursuant to 26(a)(2)(c). (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 34 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Ben Williams, M.D.. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Britt Alicia Birkenbuel on behalf of Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham. (Birkenbuel, Britt) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 32 RULE 45 NOTICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition of Ben Williams, M.D. by C. R. Bard, Inc. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Robert R. Kane, III on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc. (Kane, Robert) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #27 Notice of Continued Videotaped Deposition of Ralph Zipper, M.D. by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham (Vankirk, Anne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 (Order re: Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Remaining Plaintiffs in Bard MDL) directing (1) counsel for all plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A whose cases have not been resolved and are not subject to an agreement in principle to resolve, are directed to meet and confer with Pepper Hamilton LLP on or before 10/3/2018, and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement, (2) Messrs. Garrard and Potts and Bard Settlement Counsel are directed to provide a joint written report to the Court and Special Master Reisman via email on 10/8/2018, identifying which cases remaining on Exhibit A have not been resolved or dismissed, (3) the Court will enter an order on 10/11/2018 identifying on which of the following dates the parties in each case must appear for the settlement conference: November 7, 8 and 9, 2018 or such other date as set by the Court. Each day, the settlement conferences will begin at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston, West Virginia at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, (4) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference along with counsel of record, (5) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice, and (6) cases not settled during the settlement conference will be dealt with by further order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/11/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Sabrina R. Gallo on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Gallo, Sabrina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Ralph Zipper, M.D. on September 29, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. EDT (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Expert Reports. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER # 290 (Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Remaining Plaintiffs in Bard MDL) directing (1) counsel for all plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A whose cases have not been resolved and are not subject to an agreement in principle to resolve, are directed to meet and confer with Pepper Hamilton LLP on or before 9/14/2018, and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement, (2) Messrs. Garrard and Potts and Bard Settlement Counsel to provide a joint written report to the court and Special Master Reisman via email on 9/18/2018, identifying which cases remain on Exhibit A, (3) the Court will enter an Order on 9/21/2018 identifying on which of the following dates the parties in each case must appear for the settlement conference: October 15, 17, 18 or 19, 2018 or such other date as set by the court. Each day, the settlement conferences will begin at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston, West Virginia at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, (4) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference along with counsel of record, and (5) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/3/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham for Expert Disclosure Pursuant to PTO #283 and Non-Retained Expert Disclosure Pursuant to 26(a)(2)(c). (Vankirk, Anne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Candace Headen Uduebor updating name and/or firm information on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Headen Uduebor, Candace) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER # 283 (Amended Docket Control Order C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 275. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 7 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Active Bard Wave 7 Cases) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
June 10, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #20 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Disclosures filed in their entirety. CORRECTION: Disclosures removed and certificate of service retained. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of John Nolte, M.D. on June 19, 2018 at 04:00 p.m. MDT (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham for Expert Disclosure pursuant to PTO #275 and Non-Retained Expert Disclosure pursuant to 26 (a)(2)(c). (Vankirk, Anne) (Modified on 6/10/2018 to remove disclosures filed in their entirety and retain certificate of service) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Alan Tucker on behalf of Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham. (Tucker, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Dennie Mecham on June 20, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. MDT (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Tammie Mecham on June 20, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. MDT (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Dennie Mecham on June 6, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. MDT (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Tammie Mecham on June 6, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. MDT (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Candace Taylor Headen on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Headen, Candace) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lindsay Nicole Uhl on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Uhl, Lindsay) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jennifer Marie Little on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Little, Jennifer) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Joseph P. Griffith on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Griffith, Joseph) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anne Vankirk on behalf of Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham. (Vankirk, Anne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Dismiss With Prejudice or in the Alternative MOTION for Show Cause Order for Failure to Serve a Plaintiff Profile Form or Plaintiff Fact Sheet, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/21/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 275 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING C. R. BARD, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 7 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The stay on the Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases are incorporated in the C. R. Bard Wave 7 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 7 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 7 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 7 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (PMA) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Dismiss With Prejudice or in the Alternative MOTION for Show Cause Order for Failure to Serve a Plaintiff Profile Form or Plaintiff Fact Sheet (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Lori). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lori G. Cohen on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Dennie Mecham, Tammie Mecham. (Kulesza, Karolina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
August 24, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
August 20, 2015 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 08/06/2015. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 7/17/2015, answer due 9/15/2015. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
July 17, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 183 (Fifth Amended Briefing Schedule) entered on 07/15/2015 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]
July 16, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4027069. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mecham et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Mecham
Represented By: Alan D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennie Mecham
Represented By: Alan D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?