Logue v. Sessions
Plaintiff: Danny Logue
Defendant: Brooke J. Sessions
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00755
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Copy of letter to the court re: Six month inmate accounting statement, letter from the Utah Department of Corrections to Danny Sturgis and copy of the courts order. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Brooke J. Sessions (Originally received by the court on 10/11/2019). (Filing fee $ 400) (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Danny Logue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (tlh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/16/2019. (tlh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Danny Logue. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Appointment of Counsel)(tlh) Modified on 10/17/2019 by correcting file date (tlh).
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 10/11/2019) filed by Plaintiff Danny Logue. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logue v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke J. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?