Sunstate Equipment v. Equipment Share et al
Plaintiff: Sunstate Equipment
Defendant: Steve Meadows, Rhett Bautista, Casey Higley and Equipment Share
Case Number: 2:2019cv00784
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Equipment Share answer due 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/20/2019. (las)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one(21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/20/2019. (las)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 11/19/2019. (las)
November 15, 2019 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Equipment Share. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clegg, Perry) Modified on 11/20/2019 by correcting motion type. (las).
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Equipment Share. (nl)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #10 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal,. Answer deadline updated for Rhett Bautista answer due 11/26/2019; Equipment Share answer due 11/26/2019; Casey Higley answer due 11/26/2019; Steve Meadows answer due 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/05/2019. (nl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 File Received,,,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Rhett Bautista, Casey Higley, Steve Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE VACATING Hearing on Motion to Modify TRO set for 11/04/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Cecilia M. Romero. The motion has been withdrawn. (Notice generated by CMR Chambers) (cvm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Defendants Rhett Bautista, Casey Higley, Steve Meadows re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Casey Higley, Steve Meadows, Rhett Bautista . (Egan, Austin)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alice Kwak for Sunstate Equipment. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/28/2019. (nl)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary Franklin for Sunstate Equipment. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/28/2019. (nl)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eliot T. Burriss for Sunstate Equipment. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/28/2019. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #5 MOTION to Modify Temporary Restraining Order : (Notice generated by CMR Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 at 03:00 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. (cvm)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING. Any opposition to Defendants' Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order #5 must be filed by close of business on October 30,2019. Any reply must be filed no later than November 3, 2019. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/28/2019. (cvm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alice Kwak , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3403437, filed by Plaintiff Sunstate Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Mark)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary Franklin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3403420, filed by Plaintiff Sunstate Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Mark)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eliot T. Burriss , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 26L3154M, filed by Plaintiff Sunstate Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Mark)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Sunstate Equipment. (nl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Rhett Bautista, Casey Higley, Steve Meadows. (nl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Rhett Bautista, Equipment Share, Casey Higley, Steve Meadows, Plaintiff Sunstate Equipment. Form due by 11/7/2019. (nl)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Brewer for Equipment Share. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/23/2019. (nl)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Brewer and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3400271, filed by Defendant Equipment Share. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Registration Form)(Clegg, Perry)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Continuance of Depositions by Sunstate Equipment (Morris, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Steve Meadows. (nl)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Modify Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Rhett Bautista, Casey Higley, Steve Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration R. Bautista, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of S. Meadows, #3 Exhibit C- Declaration of C. Higley)(nl)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Application for TRO, #3 Motion for Expedited Discovery, #4 Notice of Hearing re TRO and Motions, #5 Summons Returned re Equipment Share, #6 Summons Returned C. Higley, #7 Summons Returned R. Bautista, #8 Summons Returned S. Meadows, #9 Notice of Appearance re P. Clegg, #10 Notice of Appearance re A. Kelly, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Temporary Restraining Order, #13 Order granting Motion for Expedited Discovery, #14 Minutes re TRO, #15 Return of Service re TRO R. Bautista, #16 Return of Service re TRO S. Meadows, #17 Return of Service re TRO C. Higley, #18 Notice of Limited Appearance, #19 Notice of Deposition Equiptment Share, #20 Notice of Deposition C. Higley, #21 Notice of Deposition R. Bautista, #22 Notice of Deposition S. Meadows, #23 Certificate of Service Production of Docs, #24 Motion to Modify TRO, #25 Exhibit A-Declaration R. Bautisa, #26 Exhibit B-Declaration S. Meadows, #27 Exhibit C-Declaration C. Higley, #28 State Notice of Removal, #29 Exhibit A- State Notice of Removal) (nl)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Rhett Bautista, Equipment Share, Casey Higley and Plaintiff Sunstate Equipment. (tlh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190908115, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3397856) filed by Equipment Share. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Pleadings and other filings from State Court proceedings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Clegg, Perry)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendants Rhett Bautista, Equipment Share and Casey Higley are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunstate Equipment v. Equipment Share et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunstate Equipment
Represented By: Mark O. Morris
Represented By: Alice Kwak
Represented By: Zachary J. Franklin
Represented By: Eliot T. Burriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Meadows
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett Bautista
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Higley
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipment Share
Represented By: Perry S. Clegg
Represented By: Andrea Kelly
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?