Amazon.com et al v. Amazon Services et al
Plaintiff: Amazon Services, Amazon.com and Amazon Technologies
Defendant: Creating Wealth International, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth Academy and Prime Global Source
Case Number: 2:2019cv00785
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to submit the Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall have up to and including January 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/27/2019. (jds)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Johnson, Kristine)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Creating Wealth Academy answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth Institute answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth International answer due 1/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/22/2019. (jds)
November 21, 2019 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(McConkie, James) Modified event type on 11/22/2019 (jds).
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #10 filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source (McConkie, James)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING without prejudice #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to establish good cause for the extension. If the parties seek to extend the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/20/2019. No attached document. (ang)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Creating Wealth Academy(pty:dft), Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Creating Wealth Institute(pty:dft), Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Creating Wealth International(pty:dft), Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Prime Global Source(pty:dft)(McConkie, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Prime Global Source Waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Johnson, Kristine)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Creating Wealth Academy served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Johnson, Kristine)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Creating Wealth Institute served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Johnson, Kristine)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Creating Wealth International served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Johnson, Kristine)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #10 filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com (Johnson, Kristine)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/28/2019. (jds)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/25/19. (ss)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Creating Wealth Academy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Creating Wealth Institute. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Creating Wealth International. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/19. (ss)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher T. Wion for Amazon Services,Christopher T. Wion for Amazon Technologies,Christopher T. Wion for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip S. McCune for Amazon Services,Philip S. McCune for Amazon Technologies,Philip S. McCune for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon Services,Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon Technologies,Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher T. Wion , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398331, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Christopher Wion, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(Johnson, Kristine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Taylor , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398322, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order B-Admitting Jesse Taylor, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(Johnson, Kristine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip S. McCune , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398313, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order B-Order Admitting Philip McCune, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(Johnson, Kristine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3398311) filed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Johnson, Kristine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies and Amazon.com are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com et al v. Amazon Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creating Wealth International
Represented By: James W. McConkie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creating Wealth Institute
Represented By: James W. McConkie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creating Wealth Academy
Represented By: James W. McConkie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Global Source
Represented By: James W. McConkie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Services
Represented By: Kristine E. Johnson
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Represented By: Christopher T. Wion
Represented By: Philip S. McCune
Represented By: Jesse Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com
Represented By: Kristine E. Johnson
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Represented By: Christopher T. Wion
Represented By: Philip S. McCune
Represented By: Jesse Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Technologies
Represented By: Kristine E. Johnson
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Represented By: Christopher T. Wion
Represented By: Philip S. McCune
Represented By: Jesse Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?