Puchalski et al v. TCFC HotelCo et al
Plaintiff: Carla Lynn Furuno and Jeffery Lucian Puchalski
Defendant: Dakota Mountain Lodge Homeowners Association, Hilton Grand Vacations Management and TCFC HotelCo
Case Number: 2:2019cv00812
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION to Respond to Amended Complaint re #13 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Hilton Grand Vacations Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Set Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Scott, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss And Supporting Memorandum filed by Plaintiffs Carla Lynn Furuno, Jeffery Lucian Puchalski. (Andreason, Rod)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Andreason, Rod)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Jeffery Lucian Puchalski, Carla Lynn Furuno. (Andreason, Rod)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brooks H. Spears for Hilton Grand Vacations Management. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/02/2019. (nl)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brooks H. Spears , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3431108, filed by Defendant Hilton Grand Vacations Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brooks H. Spears, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brooks H. Spears)(Scott, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss And Supporting Memorandum filed by Defendant Hilton Grand Vacations Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Attorney Robert H. Scott added to party Hilton Grand Vacations Management(pty:dft)(Scott, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeffery Lucian Puchalski, Carla Lynn Furuno as to Dakota Mountain Lodge Homeowners Association Waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Andreason, Rod)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeffery Lucian Puchalski, Carla Lynn Furuno as to TCFC HotelCo Waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Andreason, Rod)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffery Lucian Puchalski, Carla Lynn Furuno as to Hilton Grand Vacations Management served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Andreason, Rod)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/24/2019. (nl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dakota Mountain Lodge Homeowners Association. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Hilton Grand Vacations Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to TCFC HotelCo. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3401646) filed by Jeffery Lucian Puchalski, Carla Lynn Furuno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Andreason, Rod)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Carla Lynn Furuno and Jeffery Lucian Puchalski are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puchalski et al v. TCFC HotelCo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Mountain Lodge Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Grand Vacations Management
Represented By: Robert H. Scott
Represented By: Brooks H. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCFC HotelCo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Lynn Furuno
Represented By: Rod N. Andreason
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Lucian Puchalski
Represented By: Rod N. Andreason
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?