Sock City v. Doe
Plaintiff: Sock City
Defendant: John Doe and Oceanside Capital
Case Number: 2:2019cv00831
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sock City as to Oceanside Capital served on 12/5/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Jones, Casey)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Oceanside Capital, Plaintiff Sock City. Form due by 1/10/2020. (nl)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Oceanside Capital answer due 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/24/2019. (nl)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time time to answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Oceanside Capital. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Prop. Ord.) Attorney Steven L. Rinehart added to party Oceanside Capital(pty:dft)(Rinehart, Steven) Modified on 12/26/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (nl).
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Oceanside Capital. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against John Doe. New Defendants: Oceanside Capital Corp.. Removed Defendants: John Doe. filed by Sock City. (Jones, Casey)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/30/2019. (nl)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3405497) filed by Sock City. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Jones, Casey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Sock City is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sock City v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Steven L. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceanside Capital
Represented By: Steven L. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sock City
Represented By: Casey W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?