Rocky Mountain Wild et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association and Rocky Mountain Wild
Defendant: State of Utah, Bureau of Land Management and David Bernhardt
Intervenor Defendant: Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association and American Petroleum Institute, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv00929
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: David B Barlow
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed District Judge. Case Reassigned to District Judge David B. Barlow. Judge Jill N. Parrish no longer assigned to the case. Orders of the prior judge are affirmed including the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A) re 60 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case number will now read 2:19cv00929-DBB-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (rks) Modified by correcting Judge Romero's name on 1/15/2020 (rks).
January 10, 2020 Filing 61 REPLY BRIEF re #30 Brief,, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Gillespie, Stuart)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/19/19. (ss)
December 10, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management (Williams, Michelle-Ann)
December 10, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #52 filed by Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, The, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association (Reymann, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #52 filed by Defendant State of Utah (Last, Kelsie)
December 10, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #52 filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians (Gillespie, Stuart)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Rosenbaum for American Petroleum Institute, The,Steven J. Rosenbaum for Independent Petroleum Association of America,Steven J. Rosenbaum for Utah Petroleum Association. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/6/2019. (jds)
December 6, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE re #30 Brief,,, filed by American Petroleum Institute, The, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association. (Reymann, David)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley K. Ervin for American Petroleum Institute, The,Bradley K. Ervin for Independent Petroleum Association of America,Bradley K. Ervin for Utah Petroleum Association. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/6/2019. (jds)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/6/19. (ss)
December 6, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley K. Ervin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3435582, filed by Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, The, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application and ECF Registration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reymann, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Rosenbaum , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3435576, filed by Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, The, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application and ECF Registration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reymann, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of American Petroleum Institute, The, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association (Reymann, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #30 Brief,,, filed by State of Utah. (Last, Kelsie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsie Lynn Last on behalf of State of Utah, State of Utah (Last, Kelsie)
November 26, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle-Ann C. Williams on behalf of David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management (Williams, Michelle-Ann)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caitlin Alexandra Miller for Center for Biological Diversity,Caitlin Alexandra Miller for National Parks Conservation Association,Caitlin Alexandra Miller for Rocky Mountain Wild,Caitlin Alexandra Miller for WildEarth Guardians. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/25/2019. (jds)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin L. Cooley for Center for Biological Diversity,Robin L. Cooley for National Parks Conservation Association,Robin L. Cooley for Rocky Mountain Wild,Robin L. Cooley for WildEarth Guardians. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/25/2019. (jds)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart C. Gillespie for Center for Biological Diversity,Stuart C. Gillespie for National Parks Conservation Association,Stuart C. Gillespie for Rocky Mountain Wild,Stuart C. Gillespie for WildEarth Guardians. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/25/2019. (jds)
November 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caitlin Miller , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3427806, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
November 25, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin Cooley , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3427797, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
November 25, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart Gillespie , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3427781, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
November 25, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi J. McIntosh on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians (McIntosh, Heidi)
November 22, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 Plaintiffs' OPENING BRIEF. Attorney Michelle-Ann C. Williams added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle-Ann C. Williams added to party Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft)(Williams, Michelle-Ann) Modified docket entry relationship and docket text on 11/26/2019 (jds).
November 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Steven Joseph Rosenbaum, for Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, The, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association (jds)
November 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michelle-Ann C. Williams, for Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management (jds)
November 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Caitlin Alexandra Miller, Joel Minor, Robin L. Cooley, Stuart C. Gillespie, for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians (jds)
November 20, 2019 Filing 34 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish per docket text order 33 . Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Given the procedural posture of this case, reassignment to a district judge is warranted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/20/2019. (nas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 32 Case transferred in from USDC of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-01608. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse.
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO TRANSFER: #22 and #23 Motions to Transfer Case and #24 Brief in Support of Motion are granted. Entered by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/2019. (cpear) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
November 19, 2019 ***Case transferred to District of Utah. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (cpear) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 30 Plaintiffs' OPENING BRIEF re #19 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Herm Hoops, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Megan Mueller, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Cristina P. Harmon, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Jeremy Nichols, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Tracy Coppola)(Gillespie, Stuart) Modified on 10/28/2019 to edit text. (sphil, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 29 Defendant ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State of Utah.(sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/24/2019, re: #21 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. ORDERED that the State of Utah's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (# 21-1) shall be deemed filed on the date on which this order is entered. ORDERED that the clerk shall amend the case caption to add the State of Utah as a Defendant in this action and enter the Answer attached to the motion to intervene. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #23 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association. (Rosenbaum, Steven) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Utah filed by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management. (Williams, Michelle-Ann) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Transfer Case Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Transfer filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Gillespie, Stuart) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support of #22 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Amicus State of Utah. (Halverson, David) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Transfer Case by Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association. (Rosenbaum, Steven) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer)(Williams, Michelle-Ann) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Halverson, David) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/7/19. Adm Plaintiffs Brief is due by 10/25/2019. Adm Defendants Brief is due by 11/22/2019. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief is due by 1/10/2020. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LODGING THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management (Williams, Michelle-Ann) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management.(Williams, Michelle-Ann) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order JOINT by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management. (Williams, Michelle-Ann) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/05/2019. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association pursuant to #14 Order. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Intervene. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/05/2019. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene by Interested Parties American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Utah Petroleum Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Answer, #2 Exhibit 2: Milito Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit 3: Russell Declaration in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit 4: Hrenko-Browning Declaration in Support of Motion, #5 API Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 IPAA Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 UPA Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rosenbaum, Steven) Modified on 8/5/2019 to correct filer designation (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle-Ann C. Williams on behalf of David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Michelle-Ann C. Williams added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle-Ann C. Williams added to party Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Williams, Michelle-Ann) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joel Minor terminated as counsel of record for the Plaintiff Conservations Groups. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/17/2019. Text Only Entry(msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw As Counsel by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Withdraw as Counsel)(Minor, Joel) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Caitlin Alexandra Miller on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth GuardiansAttorney Caitlin Alexandra Miller added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlin Alexandra Miller added to party National Parks Conservation Association(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlin Alexandra Miller added to party Rocky Mountain Wild(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlin Alexandra Miller added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla) (Miller, Caitlin) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Notice of Proof of Service defendant(s) David Bernhardt served on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Bureau of Land Management served on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gillespie, Stuart) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joel Minor on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth GuardiansAttorney Joel Minor added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Joel Minor added to party National Parks Conservation Association(pty:pla), Attorney Joel Minor added to party Rocky Mountain Wild(pty:pla), Attorney Joel Minor added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla) (Minor, Joel) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robin L. Cooley on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth GuardiansAttorney Robin L. Cooley added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Robin L. Cooley added to party National Parks Conservation Association(pty:pla), Attorney Robin L. Cooley added to party Rocky Mountain Wild(pty:pla), Attorney Robin L. Cooley added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla) (Cooley, Robin) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Case by Stuart C. Gillespie on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, WildEarth Guardians (Gillespie, Stuart) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gillespie, Stuart) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6725882)Attorney Stuart C. Gillespie added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Stuart C. Gillespie added to party National Parks Conservation Association(pty:pla), Attorney Stuart C. Gillespie added to party Rocky Mountain Wild(pty:pla), Attorney Stuart C. Gillespie added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians, Rocky Mountain Wild, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, #2 Summons David Bernhardt, #3 Summons Bureau of Land Management, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney for Colorado Jason R. Dunn, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillespie, Stuart) [Transferred from Colorado on 11/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Wild et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Represented By: David M. Halverson
Represented By: Kelsie Lynn Last
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Represented By: Bradley K. Ervin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenbaum
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Utah Petroleum Association
Represented By: Bradley K. Ervin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenbaum
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Institute, The
Represented By: Bradley K. Ervin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenbaum
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Robin L. Cooley
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Robin L. Cooley
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Robin L. Cooley
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Wild
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Robin L. Cooley
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?