Bahamin v. Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne et al
Plaintiff: Shaheen Bahamin
Defendant: Ken Garff Automotive Group and Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne
Case Number: 2:2019cv00935
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per Notice of Dismissal #10 . (nl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Shaheen Bahamin (Broadhead, Taylor)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Ken Garff Automotive Group, Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne. (nl)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Return of Service Ken Garff Hundai Southtowne, #3 State Return of Service Ken Garff Automotive Group, #4 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/22/2019. (nl)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Shaheen Bahamin, Defendants Ken Garff Automotive Group, Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne. Form due by 12/9/2019. (tlh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Shaheen Bahamin and Defendants Ken Garff Automotive Group, Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne. (tlh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Ken Garff Automotive Group, Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bahamin Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Labor Commission, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Bahamin from UALD, #4 Exhibit D - EOC Right to Sue Letter)(Vazquez, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Ken Garff Automotive Group, Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne. (Vazquez, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190908625, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3426121) filed by Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne, Ken Garff Automotive Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint with Proofs of Service, #3 Exhibit 2 - Docket in State Case No. 190908625) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Vazquez, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendants Ken Garff Automotive Group and Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahamin v. Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Garff Automotive Group
Represented By: Richard A. Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Garff Hyundai Southtowne
Represented By: Richard A. Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheen Bahamin
Represented By: T. Jake Hinkins
Represented By: Taylor L. Broadhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?