Suda v. Knight Family Real Estate
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Defendant: Knight Family Real Estate
Case Number: 2:2019cv00968
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #11 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Knight Family Real Estate. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Thompson, James)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Knight Family Real Estate answer due 2/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/21/2020. (nl)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crane, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Knight Family Real Estate, Plaintiff Linda Suda. Form due by 1/31/2020. (nl)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Wright on behalf of Knight Family Real Estate (Wright, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Thompson on behalf of Knight Family Real Estate (Thompson, James)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Knight Family Real Estate answer due 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/6/2020. (nl)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crane, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Suda as to Knight Family Real Estate served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Crane, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Linda Suda (Crane, Matthew)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/10/2019. (nl)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Knight Family Real Estate. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Knight Family Real Estate (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3435634) filed by Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Crane, Matthew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Linda Suda is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suda v. Knight Family Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Family Real Estate
Represented By: James C. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Represented By: Matthew B. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?