Reith v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Reith
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00994
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 78 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 77 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Kathryn Reith. (nl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 76 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Coopersurgical, Inc. (nl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 75 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (nl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 74 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant The Cooper Companies, Inc. (nl)
January 29, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc, Plaintiff Kathryn Reith. Form due by 2/13/2020. (nl)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny for Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., and The Cooper Companies, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/29/2020. (nl)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh for Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., and The Cooper Companies, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/29/2020. (nl)
January 29, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3474000, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application - McIntosh, #2 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3473990, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for F Erny, #2 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy)
January 24, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc (Fowler, Tracy)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara D. Hill for Kathryn Reith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/21/2020. (nl)
January 17, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara D. Hill , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3466717, filed by Plaintiff Kathryn Reith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Application, #2 Exhibit B -ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mismash, Nancy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Mismash on behalf of Kathryn Reith (Mismash, Nancy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys Derek T. Braslow, Tobias Millrood, and Kara D. Hill for Plaintiff Kathryn Reith; and to Brian Rubenstein, Gregory T. Sturges, and Frederick M. Erny for Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 PHV Req for Brian Rubenstein, #2 PHV Req for Gregory T. Sturges, #3 PHV Req for Frederick M. Erny) (alt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 63 Case transferred in from USDC of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03987. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead.
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. PURSUANT TO RULE 20 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/19/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 11/19/2019 (jl, ). (filed in error duplicate filing) (Main Document 62 replaced on 11/19/2019) (jl, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THE DEFENDANTS TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., AND THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(A) TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF UTAH IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. PURSUANT TO RULE 20 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19.11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 First MOTION for Joinder of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc Reply in Support of filed by KATHRYN REITH. (HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 First MOTION for Joinder of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 56 Memorandum Reply in Support re #43 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings filed by KATHRYN REITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 54 First MOTION for Joinder of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by KATHRYN REITH.Joinder TUSA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. Pkt, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 9/27/19 IS VACATED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ANY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE 11/1/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/15/19. 10/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TEVA WOMAN'S HEALTH, INC. IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 10/25/19, RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/27/19. 9/27/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mbh, ). (VACATED PER ORDER #53) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 51 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses re #49 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 9/23/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/9/19. 9/10/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by KATHRYN REITH.Memorandum, Certificate of Good Faith, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Good Faith, #3 Exhibit A Plaintiffs Initial Discovery Requests as to Venue, #4 Exhibit B Defendants Initial Discovery Response, #5 Exhibit C Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Deficient Responses, #6 Exhibit D Plaintiffs Joint Letter re: Meet & Confer, #7 Exhibit E - Defendants First Supplemental Response to Discovery)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III CONFERENCE held on 7/2/19. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. A CONFERENCE NOT ON THE RECORD was held on 7/1/19. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 5/15/19 23 IS VACATED. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A) ON OR BEFORE JULY 12, 2019. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AN SERVE, ON OR BEFORE JULY 31, 2019, ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 12, 2019, ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(C) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/1/19. 7/2/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings. RESPONSES DUE BY 7/12/2019. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE ON OR BEFORE 5/29/19 INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE INTERROGATORIES ON OR BEFORE 6/28/19. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/12/19 ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/22/19 ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(b)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/15/19. 5/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (JL) (ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO JUDGE BARTLE'S ORDER OF 7/2/219 #46 ) Modified 7/2/19 (fdc). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 44 Minute Entry for STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/15/19, before Judge BARTLE. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for Status Conference not on the record was held on 4/22/19, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. (ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 5/13/19 AT 12:00 P.M., ANY MOTIONS UNDER 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a), RULE 12 (b)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, AND RULE 12 (c) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE IN CHAMBERS ON 5/15/19 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/22/19. 4/22/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( MOTION TO DISMISS DUE BY 5/13/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/15/2019 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2019 10:00 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS TO REMAND THESE ACTIONS TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA ARE DENIED. THE DEFENDANTS TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. AND TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. ARE DISMISSED FROM BOTH ACTIONS AS FRAUDULENTLY JOINED. THE DEFENDANT THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. IS DISMISSED AS FRAUDULENTLY JOINED IN CIVIL ACTION NO.18-3992 ONLY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/27/19. 3/27/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS TO REMAND THESE ACTIONS TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA ARE DENIED. THE DEFENDANTS TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. AND TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. ARE DISMISSED FROM BOTH ACTIONS AS FRAUDULENTLY JOINED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/27/19. 3/27/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III Motion Hearing held on 3/18/19 re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by KATHRYN REITH Court Reporter: ESR. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #17 MOTION to Remand : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/18/2019 10:30 AM IN COURTROOM 16-A BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. THIS PROCEEDING HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FROM 3/13/2019.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #17 MOTION to Remand : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/13/2019 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 16-A BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR #17 MOTION TO REMAND TO THE PHILA. COURT OF COMMON PLEAS filed by KATHRYN REITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MILLROOD, TOBIAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by KATHRYN REITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Memorandum L)(MILLROOD, TOBIAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 1/4/19 IS VACATED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 2/11/19, ANY SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO REMAND; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/4/19. 2/4/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 12/6/18 IS VACATED. DISCOVERY WILL BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED BY 1/23/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/4/19. 1/4/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jl, ). (VACATED PER #30) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. Conference Not On Record held on 1/2/19. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 10/19/18 IS VACATED. DISCOVERY WILL BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED BY 1/8/19. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 1/18/19, ANY SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO REMAND; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/6/18. 12/6/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 1/4/2019 (jl, ). (VACATED PER #29) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Remand .( RESPONSES DUE BY 1/18/2019.), Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/8/2019.) (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by KARA D. HILL on behalf of KATHRYN REITH (HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by KATHRYN REITH Firm Name Change (MILLROOD, TOBIAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III CONFERENCE held on 11/13/18. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 22 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY WILL BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED BY 12/17/18; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/19/18. 10/19/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jl, ). (VACATED PER #27) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III Conference held on 10/17/18. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 19 Remark THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2018 IS CANCELLED. (km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RUBENSTEIN on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand filed by KATHRYN REITH.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(MILLROOD, TOBIAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by TOBIAS MILLROOD on behalf of KATHRYN REITH with Jury Demand(MILLROOD, TOBIAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/16/2018 09:30 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC.. by TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 180300608. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184812) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reith v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Reith
Represented By: Nancy A. Mismash
Represented By: Kara D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?