Royal Merchant Holdings v. Traeger Pellet Grills
Petitioner: Royal Merchant Holdings
Respondent: Traeger Pellet Grills
Case Number: 2:2019mc00108
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
2 Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Non Response by Traeger Pellet Grills re 20 Motion Hearing,,,, (White, Juliette)
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 Supplemental MEMORANDUM re #21 Response (NOT to motion) Memorandum Regarding Citizenship of Royal Merchant Holdings, LLC filed by Royal Merchant Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Decl. of N. Panahpour in Supp of Petitioner's Supp Memo Re Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit "B" Decl. of R. Levy in Supp of Petitioner's Supplemental Memo Re Jurisdiction)(McMurray, William)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The Court ORDERS Royal Merchant Holdings, LLC to disclose the names and citizenship of its members by the close of business on Tuesday, April 9, 2019. The statement in Petitioner's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Jurisdiction #21 that "Royal's members are domiciled in and therefore are citizens of Florida and Tennessee" is insufficient. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/8/2019. (nas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 Supplemental RESPONSE re 20 Motion Hearing,,,,,Petitioner's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Jurisdiction filed by Royal Merchant Holdings. (McMurray, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2019 re #12 MOTION to Expedite Traeger's Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena filed by Traeger Pellet Grills. Court hears argument from counsel and TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT #2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Arbitral Subpoena. Court instructs counsel for the Plaintiff to submit additional briefing re: jurisdiction by Friday, 4/5/2019. Defendants may respond, if so, response to be filed by Thursday, 4/11/2019. If defense counsel will not be filing a response, Court instructs counsel to submit a notice stating a response will not be filed. Attorney for Plaintiff: D. Craig Parry, William Ashley McMurray, Attorney for Defendant: Molly K. Honore (TELEPHONIC), Juliette P. White. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 10:03:45, Time End: 10:48:12, Room 7.100.)(lnp)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Molly K. Honore for Traeger Pellet Grills. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/2/2019. (mas)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear By Telephone. Conference call information to be emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/1/2019. No attached document. (lnp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone and Memorandum in Support filed by Respondent Traeger Pellet Grills. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(White, Juliette)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Molly K. Honore , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3239573, filed by Respondent Traeger Pellet Grills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(White, Juliette)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Expedite Traeger's Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena filed by Petitioner Royal Merchant Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Arbitral Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B Traeger's Objection to First Subpoena, #3 Exhibit C Second Arbitral Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Email Reserving Royal's Rights to Discovery After Second Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Transcript Excerpt From 12.6.18, #6 Exhibit Third Arbitral Subpoena, #7 Exhibit Signed Decl. Maria A. Fehretdinov, #8 Exhibit Return of Service Dated 2019.01.04, #9 Exhibit Supplemental Authority, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Request for Extended Briefing, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Short Form Discovery Motion)(McMurray, William)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #12 MOTION to Expedite Traeger's Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena : (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 ERRATA to #12 MOTION to Expedite Traeger's Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena filed by Respondent Traeger Pellet Grills . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Summons)(White, Juliette)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite Traeger's Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena and Memorandum in Support , MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena filed by Respondent Traeger Pellet Grills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Arbitration Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order B-Granting Traeger's Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash or Modify Arbitral Subpoena, #3 Text of Proposed Order C-Granting Traeger's Request for Extended Briefing) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(White, Juliette)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Arbitral Subpoena filed by Respondent Traeger Pellet Grills. (White, Juliette)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Arbitral Subpoena : (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Arbitral Subpoena. Response due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/11/2019. No attached document. (nas)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/11/2019. (reb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Thomas Burton on 02/19/2019, filed by Petitioner Royal Merchant Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Petition to Compel Compliance With Arbitral Subpoena)(McMurray, William)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Dale A. Kimball recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/4/2019. (eat)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Robert J. Shelby recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/1/2019. (jds)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitration Subpoena and Memorandum in Support filed by Respondent Traeger Pellet Grills. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Juliette) Modified by changing event type to motion for extension of time to file response/reply on 3/1/2019 (eat).
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliette P. White on behalf of Traeger Pellet Grills (White, Juliette)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Arbitral Subpoena filed by Petitioner Royal Merchant Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Arbitral Subpoena Jan 4, 2019, #3 Exhibit B - Return of Service Dated Jan 4, 2019)(McMurray, William)
February 15, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Motion to Compel received from Petitioner Royal Merchant Holdings. (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 1088-3206673). (McMurray, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Petitioner Royal Merchant Holdings is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 47 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Compel and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Merchant Holdings v. Traeger Pellet Grills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Traeger Pellet Grills
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Royal Merchant Holdings
Represented By: William Ashley McMurray
Represented By: D. Craig Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?