Brasher v. Allstate Indemnity
Plaintiff: Donald Brasher
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity
Case Number: 2:2019mc00395
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #14 and hereby orders that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice and TERMINATED in its entirety, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/26/2019. (kpf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING set for 7/29/2019 at 1:00 PM before Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Notice generated by EJF Chambers). (lnp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant Allstate Indemnity (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Higgins, Roger)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #2 MOTION to Expedite Resolution of Short Form Discovery and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum : (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2019 at 01:00 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #11 Agreed Motion to Stay Consideration of Allstate's Motion to Quash Brasher's Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum of Non-Party Xactware Solutions, Inc., or for Protective Order. For good cause appearing, the Court STAYS consideration of the Motion to Quash for twenty (20) days, or until July 18, 2019. Allstate and Brasher must notify this Court of any resolution prior to July 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/28/2019. No attached document. (nas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION to Expedite Resolution of Short Form Discovery and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Defendant Allstate Indemnity. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Higgins, Roger)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger D. Higgins on behalf of Allstate Indemnity (Higgins, Roger)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/27/2019. (cdp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul W. Evans for Plaingiff Donald Brasher. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/11/2019. (las)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Expedite Resolution of Short Form Discovery and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Plaintiff Donald Brasher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order on Motion for Protective Order)(Simmons, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roger D. Higgins for Allstate IndemnityAttorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/11/2019. (las)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul W. Evans , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3298277, filed by Plaintiff Donald Brasher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Simmons, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Simmons on behalf of Donald Brasher (Simmons, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roger D. Higgins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3295221, filed by Defendant Allstate Indemnity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Pro Hac Vice Application), #2 Exhibit B (ECF Registration), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brough, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Resolution of Short Form Discovery and Memorandum in Support , MOTION for Short Form Discovery re: Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Defendant Allstate Indemnity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Subpoena), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brough, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Motion to Quash received from Defendant Allstate Indemnity. (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 1088-3295052). (Brough, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Defendant Allstate Indemnity is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 47.00 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Quash and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brasher v. Allstate Indemnity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brasher
Represented By: Paul Wesley Evans
Represented By: Paul M. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity
Represented By: Daniel K. Brough
Represented By: Roger D. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?