Bacon v. Bureau of Prisons Designation and Computation Center
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons Designation and Computation Center
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2020cv00030
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Michael A. Bacon received from Correctional Institution (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Petitioner shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file with the Court a certified copy of Petitioner's inmate trust fund account statements for the six months. If Petitioner does not fully comply, this case will be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/22/2020. (nl)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 01/15/2020) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Bureau of Prisons Designation and Computation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons Designation and Computation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?