Ecker v. Haddon et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Ecker
Defendant: FNU Bussio, Mike Haddon and FNU Powell
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00035
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re: Amended Complaint #10 by Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Law re #10 Amended Complaint filed by Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Jacob Ecker received from Correctional Institution (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Bussio, Mike Haddon, FNU Powell filed by Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kpf)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Jacob Ecker. (kpf)
February 24, 2020 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 11.98 received, receipt number 4681089652. (nl)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBITS filed by Jacob Ecker re #5 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Envelope)(kpf)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Jacob Ecker in Support re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the initial partial fee of $11.98 filed by Plaintiff Jacob Ecker. (kpf)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the initial partial fee of $11.98 filed by Plaintiff Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against FNU Bussio, Mike Haddon, FNU Powell (Originally received by the court on 01/16/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $11.98. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 01/22/2020. (tlh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Counsel)(tlh)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Jacob Ecker received from Correctional Institution (tlh)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 01/16/2020) filed by Plaintiff Jacob Ecker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Proceed without Prepaying Fees)(tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecker v. Haddon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bussio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Haddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?