Carradine v. Express Recovery Services
Plaintiff: Jacob Carradine
Defendant: Express Recovery Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv00069
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to case. (las)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jacob Carradine. (Hussey, Curtis)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Express Recovery Services. Attorney Joseph J. Lico added to party Express Recovery Services(pty:dft)(Lico, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Carradine as to Express Recovery Services served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Hussey, Curtis)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/14/2020. (las)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/13/2020. (tlc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Express Recovery Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Express Recovery Services (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3482521) filed by Jacob Carradine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Hussey, Curtis)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff Jacob Carradine is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carradine v. Express Recovery Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Carradine
Represented By: Curtis R. Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Recovery Services
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?