Rohwedder v. Sperry et al
Plaintiff: Billy L. Rohwedder
Defendant: Unified Police Department and Warenski Sperry
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2020cv00081
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy L. Rohwedder. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (eat)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Warenski Sperry, Unified Police Department (Originally received by the court on 02/07/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Billy L. Rohwedder. Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (tlh)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 02/18/2020. (tlh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attachment exhibit re #4 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Billy L. Rohwedder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minutes)(kpf)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Billy L. Rohwedder received from Correctional Institution. (eat)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 02/07/2020) filed by Plaintiff Billy L. Rohwedder. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohwedder v. Sperry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy L. Rohwedder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warenski Sperry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?