Singer et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Addison Singer, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez and Christopher Martellaro
Defendant: Angela Goldinger, Laura McNeer, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 2:2020cv00105
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Motions granted #13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Laura McNeer, Angela Goldinger, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/13/20. (jrj)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Angela Goldinger, Laura McNeer, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order na) Attorney John K. Mangum added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney John K. Mangum added to party Angela Goldinger(pty:dft), Attorney John K. Mangum added to party Laura McNeer(pty:dft), Attorney John K. Mangum added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:dft)(Mangum, John)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Addison Singer, Christopher Martellaro. Chad F. Wolf served on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Heier, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Addison Singer, Christopher Martellaro. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Heier, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Addison Singer, Christopher Martellaro. Laura McNeer served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Heier, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Addison Singer, Christopher Martellaro. Angela Goldinger served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Heier, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Addison Singer, Christopher Martellaro as to Laura McNeer served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Heier, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the United States Attorney for the District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Angela Goldinger. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chad F. Wolf. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Laura McNeer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Mandamus against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3495896) filed by Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Addison Singer, Christopher Martellaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit I-130 Receipt Amaya-Ramirez, #3 Exhibit I-130 Receipt Lobo-Lopez, #4 Exhibit birth certificate of Addison Singer, #5 Exhibit marriage license for Singer and Amaya-Ramirez, #6 Exhibit birth certificate for Christopher Martellaro, #7 Exhibit marriage license for Martellaro and Lobo-Lopez) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Heier, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Plaintiffs Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez, Caren M. Lobo-Lopez, Christopher Martellaro, Addison Singer is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singer et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Goldinger
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura McNeer
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ysaac Amaya-Ramirez
Represented By: David C. Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addison Singer
Represented By: David C. Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caren M. Lobo-Lopez
Represented By: David C. Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Martellaro
Represented By: David C. Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?