Suda v. Chun
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Defendant: Tami Chun
Case Number: 2:2020cv00146
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement Agreement by Tami Chun (Harrison, Matt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Tami Chun, Plaintiff Linda Suda. Form due by 5/8/2020. (nl)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. VanOrman on behalf of Tami Chun (VanOrman, Kristin)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt W. Harrison on behalf of Tami Chun (Harrison, Matt)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Tami Chun answer due 4/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/2/2020. (nl)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as moot #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. A corrected motion has been refiled at #7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 04/02/2020. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crane, Matthew)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crane, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Suda as to Tami Chun served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Crane, Matthew)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/9/2020. (nl)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tami Chun. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Tami Chun (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3513714) filed by Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Crane, Matthew)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Linda Suda is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suda v. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Represented By: Matthew B. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Chun
Represented By: Kristin A. VanOrman
Represented By: Matt W. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?