Cloward v. Race et al
Plaintiff: Adam Cloward
Defendant: Jolayne Sampson, D. Thornton, Jolayne Jodie Sampson, Robert Naylor, Salt Lake County, Unified Police Department and Aymee Race
Case Number: 2:2020cv00165
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULING & ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Amend Complaint, Motion to Order Defendants to Provide Information, Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/4/20. (dla)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salt Lake County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Salt Lake County. (tlh)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Unified Police Department. (dla)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Jolayne Sampson. (dla)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to D. Thornton. (dla)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Aymee Race. (dla)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendants and Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion to Amend Complaint, to include more defendant's names, and, or Change the First Name Listed in my Complaint. As Well as Make any Necessary Amendments to my Complaint as I See Fit and to Avoid Unnecessary Delay filed by Plaintiff Adam Cloward. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. (dla)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Naylor, Aymee Race, Salt Lake County, Jolayne Sampson, D. Thornton, Unified Police Department with Jury Demand, filed by Adam Cloward (alt)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULING & ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; and 2) Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Service of Process is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/24/20. (dla)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE AFFIRMING PRIOR ORDER OF REFERENCE re 4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Orders of the prior judge are affirmed including the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B). (dla)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for all further proceedings. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/23/20. (dla)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/20/2020. (mjm)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Adam Cloward. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Service of Process)(tlh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Adam Cloward. (tlh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681089883) (Fee Status: PAID) filed by Adam Cloward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloward v. Race et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolayne Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolayne Jodie Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aymee Race
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?