C. v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Miguel C.
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company and Cirrus Logic Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00300
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Miguel C. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (King, Brian)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Miguel C. as to Cirrus Logic Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan Waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (King, Brian)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/8/2020. (jds)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/7/2020. (tlc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, Cirrus Logic Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3567951) filed by Miguel C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (King, Brian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff Miguel C. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirrus Logic Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel C.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?